No. 15-170 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 7, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-1369) |
Decision Date: | May 7, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 5 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2015) |
Sep 2 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 8, 2015. |
Sep 30 2015 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 9, 2015. |
Nov 5 2015 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 9, 2015. |
Dec 9 2015 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Dec 23 2015 | Reply of petitioner Ryan Morris filed. |
Dec 30 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016. |
Jan 19 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Matthew R. Segal | American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Massa | (617) 482-3170 |
Counsel of Record | 211 Congress Street | |
3rd Floor | ||
Boston, MA 02110 | ||
MSegal@aclum.org | ||
Party name: Ryan Morris | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |